IA SF357 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to Medicaid program integrity, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1127.) Effective 7-1-13.
Title
A bill for an act relating to Medicaid program integrity, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1127.) Effective 7-1-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 778. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 718. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 718. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 610. |
2013-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 616. |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 1. H.J. 611. |
2013-03-19 | House | Substituted for HF 553. H.J. 611. |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 564. |
2013-03-14 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 561. |
2013-03-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 545. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 528. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 525. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 416. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 413. |