IA SF351 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 952.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 952.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the elimination of the Iowa emergency response commission. (Formerly SSB 1081.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the elimination of the Iowa emergency response commission. (Formerly SSB 1081.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 952. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 880. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 880. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 827. |
2017-03-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 817. |
2017-03-30 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 897. |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays 0. H.J. 815. |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 759. |
2017-03-13 | House | Subcommittee: Watts, Bergan and Oldson. H.J. 627. |
2017-03-03 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 509. |
2017-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 500. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 441. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 439. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 407. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 398. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1081 (Related) 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.