IA SSB1081 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF351
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the elimination of the Iowa emergency response commission.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the elimination of the Iowa emergency response commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2017 3:00PM Room 206 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Brown, and Danielson. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF351 (Replaced by) 2017-04-07 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 952.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1081 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1081.html |