IA SF323 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 905.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 905.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to notification of the general assembly concerning certain state government leases and real property acquisitions.(Formerly SSB 1019.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to notification of the general assembly concerning certain state government leases and real property acquisitions.(Formerly SSB 1019.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 905. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | HF 314 substituted. S.J. 904. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 314. S.J. 321. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 317. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 310. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1019 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 323.