IA SF316 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Amendment H-8005 filed. H.J. 213.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Amendment H-8005 filed. H.J. 213.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requesting the establishment of a special education interim study committee. (Formerly SF 206.)
Title
A bill for an act requesting the establishment of a special education interim study committee. (Formerly SF 206.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Amendment H-8005 filed. H.J. 213. |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee amendment H-8003 filed. H.J. 213. |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calender. H.J. 209. |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 209. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on calendar. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: Upon Adjournment House Lounge. |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Gassman, Hanusa and James. H.J. 141. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-03-27 | House | Amendment H-1084 filed. H.J. 667. |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 624. |
2019-03-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-03-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/18/2019 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-13 | House | Subcommittee: A. Meyer, Brink and Mascher. H.J. 549. |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 529. |
2019-03-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 501. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 582. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 582. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 345. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 341. |
Same As/Similar To
SF206 (Similar To) 2019-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 316. S.J. 345.