IA SF206 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 316. S.J. 345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 316. S.J. 345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requesting the establishment of a special education interim study committee. (See SF 316.)
Title
A bill for an act requesting the establishment of a special education interim study committee. (See SF 316.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 316. S.J. 345. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Celsi, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 273. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 244. |
Same As/Similar To
SF316 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Amendment H-8005 filed. H.J. 213.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF206 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF206.html |