IA SF31 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 348. S.J. 336.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 348. S.J. 336.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the opening, administration, and termination of adult and minor guardianships and conservatorships.(See SF 348.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the opening, administration, and termination of adult and minor guardianships and conservatorships.(See SF 348.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dawson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 348. S.J. 336. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 2:30PM RM 24A. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 79. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 26. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB38 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 613.
SF348 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Message from House, with amendment S-5111. S.J. 674.
HF836 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1203.
SF348 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Message from House, with amendment S-5111. S.J. 674.
HF836 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1203.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF31 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF31.html |