IA SF305 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the transfer of real estate and the filing of a mortgage release certificate, providing for a fee and making remedies applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1073; see SF 445.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the transfer of real estate and the filing of a mortgage release certificate, providing for a fee and making remedies applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1073; see SF 445.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dotzler, Hogg, and Schneider. S.J. 386. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 369. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 363. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 358. |