IA SF290 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act modifying licensing provisions applicable to electricians and electrical contractors. (See SF 357.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act modifying licensing provisions applicable to electricians and electrical contractors. (See SF 357.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2017-02-21SenateSubcommittee: Zumbach, Edler, and Taylor. S.J. 371.
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 357.

Same As/Similar To

HSB86 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 430.
SF357 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 761.
HF443 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 562.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback