IA HF443 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying licensing provisions applicable to electricians and electrical contractors. (Formerly HSB 86.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying licensing provisions applicable to electricians and electrical contractors. (Formerly HSB 86.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 562. |
2017-03-08 | House | SF 357 substituted. H.J. 547. |
2017-03-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 467. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB86 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 430.
SF290 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF357 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 761.
SF290 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF357 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 761.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF443 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF443.html |