IA SF289 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the department of homeland security and emergency management. (Formerly SSB 1033.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the department of homeland security and emergency management. (Formerly SSB 1033.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 653. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | House File 307 substituted. S.J. 652. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3049 adopted. S.J. 652. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3049 filed. S.J. 598. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 364. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 356. |