IA SF270 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 761.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of accessory after the fact if the public offense involves a murder, and providing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of accessory after the fact if the public offense involves a murder, and providing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-09SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 761.
2024-04-09SenateHF 2422 substituted. S.J. 760.
2024-04-09SenateAmendment S-5126 filed, adopted. S.J. 760.
2024-03-18SenateAttached to HF 2422. S.J. 551.
2024-03-14SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536.
2024-01-31SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 186.
2024-01-22SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2024-01-18SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2024 12:30PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2024-01-11SenateSubcommittee: Evans, Bisignano, and Rowley. S.J. 96.
2023-06-05SenateReferred to Judiciary. S.J. 1091.
2023-03-03SenateFiscal note.
2023-03-01SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 452.
2023-02-22SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-02-20SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-02-14SenateSubcommittee: Evans, Bisignano, and Rowley. S.J. 323.
2023-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 313.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback