IA SF2420 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 851.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 851.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to state behavioral health, disability, and addictive disorder services and related programs, including the transition of behavioral health services from a mental health and disability services system to a behavioral health service system, the transfer of disability services to the division of aging and disability services of the department of health and human services, the elimination of the commission on aging, the elimination of special intellectual disability units at state mental health institutes, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SF 2354, SSB 3146.)
Title
A bill for an act related to state behavioral health, disability, and addictive disorder services and related programs, including the transition of behavioral health services from a mental health and disability services system to a behavioral health service system, the transfer of disability services to the division of aging and disability services of the department of health and human services, the elimination of the commission on aging, the elimination of special intellectual disability units at state mental health institutes, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SF 2354, SSB 3146.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 851. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | HF 2673 substituted. S.J. 848. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-5122 adopted. S.J. 848. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-5122 filed. S.J. 755. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Attached to HF 2673. S.J. 723. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 668. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 667. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3146 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2354.
HSB653 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2509.
HF2509 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 713.
SF2354 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2420. S.J. 668.
HF2673 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - NOBA: Senate Floor
HSB653 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2509.
HF2509 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 713.
SF2354 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2420. S.J. 668.
HF2673 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - NOBA: Senate Floor