IA SSB3146 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2354.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2354.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the transition of behavioral health services from a mental health and disability services system to a behavioral health service system, and the transfer of disability services to the division of aging and disability services of the department of health and human services, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2354, SF 2420.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the transition of behavioral health services from a mental health and disability services system to a behavioral health service system, and the transfer of disability services to the division of aging and disability services of the department of health and human services, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2354, SF 2420.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2354. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2024 10:00AM Room G15. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Trone Garriott. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
HSB653 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2509.
HF2509 (Replaced by) 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 713.
SF2354 (Replaced by) 2024-03-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2420. S.J. 668.
HF2673 (Replaced by) 2024-05-24 - NOBA: Final
SF2420 (Replaced by) 2024-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 851.
HF2509 (Replaced by) 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 713.
SF2354 (Replaced by) 2024-03-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2420. S.J. 668.
HF2673 (Replaced by) 2024-05-24 - NOBA: Final
SF2420 (Replaced by) 2024-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 851.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3146 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3146.html |