IA SF2418 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 889.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 889.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to renewable fuel infrastructure, including by providing for a financing program, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3187.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to renewable fuel infrastructure, including by providing for a financing program, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3187.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 889. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | HF 2687 substituted. S.J. 888. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Attached to HF 2687. S.J. 837. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 667. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 666. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3187 (Related) 2024-03-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2418.
HSB742 (Related) 2024-04-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2687.
HF2687 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 940.
HSB742 (Related) 2024-04-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2687.
HF2687 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 940.