IA HSB742 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2418
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2687
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2687
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2687.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2687.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to ethanol blended gasoline, by providing for gasoline storage and dispensing infrastructure and a financing program, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2687.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to ethanol blended gasoline, by providing for gasoline storage and dispensing infrastructure and a financing program, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2687.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2687. |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 713. |
2024-03-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-03-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2024 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2024-03-25 | House | Subcommittee: Mommsen, Scheetz and Stone. H.J. 657. |
2024-03-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 657. |
2024-03-25 | House | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3187 (Related) 2024-03-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2418.
SF2418 (Replaced by) 2024-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 889.
HF2687 (Replaced by) 2024-04-26 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/26.
SF2418 (Replaced by) 2024-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 889.
HF2687 (Replaced by) 2024-04-26 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/26.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB742 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB742.html |