IA SF2413 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 764.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to agriculture and food, including the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2387, SSB 3172.) Effective date: 06/10/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to agriculture and food, including the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2387, SSB 3172.) Effective date: 06/10/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 764.
2020-06-10SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 764.
2020-06-09SenateMessage from House. S.J. 715.
2020-06-05HouseImmediate message. H.J. 664.
2020-06-05HousePassed House, yeas 59, nays 37. H.J. 654.
2020-06-05HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 654.
2020-06-05HouseSubstituted for HF 2626. H.J. 654.
2020-06-05HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 650.
2020-06-05HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 649.
2020-06-05SenateImmediate message. S.J. 707.
2020-06-05SenatePassed Senate, yeas 34, nays 11. S.J. 706.
2020-06-05SenateAmendment S-5109 adopted. S.J. 706.
2020-06-05SenateAmendment S-5110 to S-5109 filed, lost. S.J. 705.
2020-06-05SenateAmendment S-5109 filed. S.J. 705.
2020-06-04SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 684.
2020-06-04SenateIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 680.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3172 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2387.
HSB684 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 308.
SF2387 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2413. S.J. 684.
HF2591 (Similar To) 2020-06-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 664.
HF2626 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 666.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback