IA HF2626 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 666.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 666.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, including by providing for administration, programs, and regulations, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HF 2591, HSB 684.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, including by providing for administration, programs, and regulations, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HF 2591, HSB 684.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 666. |
2020-06-05 | House | SF 2413 substituted. H.J. 654. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendment H-8206 adopted, as amended. H.J. 653. |
2020-06-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 653. |
2020-06-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8206, as amended. H.J. 652. |
2020-06-05 | House | Speaker ruled the point well taken and H-8206, as amended, not germane H.J. 652. |
2020-06-05 | House | Point of order raised H-8206 as amended, was not germane. H.J. 652. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendment H-8227 to amendment H-8206 filed, ruled out of order. H.J. 652. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendment H-8226 to amendment H-8206 filed, ruled out of order. H.J. 652. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendment H-8237 to amendment H-8206 filed, adopted. H.J. 652. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendment H-8238 to amendment H-8206 lost. H.J. 652. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendment H-8238 to amendment H-8206 filed. H.J. 651. |
2020-06-04 | House | Amendment H-8206 filed. H.J. 646. |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 626. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3172 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2387.
HSB684 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 308.
SF2387 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2413. S.J. 684.
HF2591 (Similar To) 2020-06-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 664.
SF2413 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 764.
HSB684 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 308.
SF2387 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2413. S.J. 684.
HF2591 (Similar To) 2020-06-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 664.
SF2413 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 764.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2626 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2626.html |