IA SF2387 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2413. S.J. 684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2413. S.J. 684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, including by providing for administration, programs, and regulations, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3172; See SF 2413.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, including by providing for administration, programs, and regulations, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3172; See SF 2413.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2413. S.J. 684. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2020 10:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Dawson, and Wahls. S.J. 469. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 407. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 396. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 395. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3172 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2387.
HSB684 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 308.
HF2591 (Similar To) 2020-06-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 664.
HF2626 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 666.
SF2413 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 764.
HSB684 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 308.
HF2591 (Similar To) 2020-06-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 664.
HF2626 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 666.
SF2413 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 764.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2387 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2387.html |