IA SF2380 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 943.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 943.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act to designate February 1 of each year as George Washington Carver Day. Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act to designate February 1 of each year as George Washington Carver Day. Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Whitver [R] | Sen. Zach Wahls [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 943. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 942. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 907. |
2022-05-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 917. |
2022-05-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 88, nays 0. H.J. 911. |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 865. |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 865. |
2022-04-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-04-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/26/2022 9:00AM Room 103 Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2022-04-26 | House | Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Siegrist and Thede. H.J. 864. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Administration and Rules. H.J. 851. |
2022-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 851. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 794. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 788. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 782. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/12/2022 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Wahls, and Zumbach. S.J. 725. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Rules and Administration. S.J. 682. |