IA SF2379 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting from the Iowa individual income tax the amount of income resulting from prize money and medals received from competition in the olympic or paralympic games, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (See SF 2399.)
Title
A bill for an act exempting from the Iowa individual income tax the amount of income resulting from prize money and medals received from competition in the olympic or paralympic games, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (See SF 2399.)
Sponsors
Sen. Roby Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, Feenstra, and Hogg. S.J. 423. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 396. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2399 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 780.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2379 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2379.html |