IA SF2377 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 812.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 812.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including eligibility for grants under the teach Iowa scholar program, licenses issued by the board of educational examiners, and the use of revenues from the district management levy, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2202, SSB 3067.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including eligibility for grants under the teach Iowa scholar program, licenses issued by the board of educational examiners, and the use of revenues from the district management levy, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2202, SSB 3067.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 812. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 812. |
2022-04-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-03-31 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/05/2022 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2022-03-30 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Gjerde and Siegrist. H.J. 750. |
2022-03-30 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 736. |
2022-03-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 710. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 645. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 644. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Amendment S-5096 adopted, as amended. S.J. 644. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Amendment S-5100 to S-5096 filed, adopted. S.J. 644. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Amendment S-5096 filed. S.J. 644. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 562. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 560. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3067 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2202.
SF2202 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2377. S.J. 562.
SF2202 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2377. S.J. 562.