IA SSB3067 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2202
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2377
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2377
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including eligibility for grants under the teach Iowa scholar program, licenses issued by the board of educational examiners, and the use of revenues from the district management levy, and including applicability provisions.(See SF 2202, SF 2377.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including eligibility for grants under the teach Iowa scholar program, licenses issued by the board of educational examiners, and the use of revenues from the district management levy, and including applicability provisions.(See SF 2202, SF 2377.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2202. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2022 2:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Goodwin, and Quirmbach. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SF2202 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2377. S.J. 562.
SF2377 (Replaced by) 2022-04-05 - Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 812.
SF2377 (Replaced by) 2022-04-05 - Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 812.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3067 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3067.html |