IA SF2377 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - Subcommittee: Jones, Bennett and Gustafson. H.J. 552.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - Subcommittee: Jones, Bennett and Gustafson. H.J. 552.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing an administrator in charge of any facility for the detention or custody of juveniles to lock the facility. (Formerly SF 2132.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing an administrator in charge of any facility for the detention or custody of juveniles to lock the facility. (Formerly SF 2132.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Bennett and Gustafson. H.J. 552. |
2018-03-07 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 496. |
2018-03-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 491. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 559. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 559. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 401. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 396. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2132 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Garrett, and Kinney. S.J. 195.