IA SF2377 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1074.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1074.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch. (Formerly SSB 3242.) Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch. (Formerly SSB 3242.) Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1074. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Message from House. S.J. 1064. | |
2010-03-30 | Immediate message. H.J. 1552. | |
2010-03-30 | Motion to reconsider vote withdrawn. H.J. 1552. | |
2010-03-17 | Motion filed to reconsider vote on the bill by McCarthy. H.J. 1000. | |
2010-03-17 | Passed House, ayes 55, nays 41. H.J. 992. | |
2010-03-17 | Substituted for HF 2521. H.J. 992. | |
2010-03-16 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 966. | |
2010-03-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 966. | |
2010-03-16 | Immediate message. S.J. 847. | |
2010-03-16 | Passed Senate, ayes 31, nays 18. S.J. 840. | |
2010-03-15 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 835. | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 834. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0945B&ga=83 |