IA SF2373 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2405. S.J. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2405. S.J. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying provisions related to the distribution formula for general state financial aid to community colleges and including applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3164; See SF 2405.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying provisions related to the distribution formula for general state financial aid to community colleges and including applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3164; See SF 2405.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2405. S.J. 466. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2024 12:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, J. Taylor, and Winckler. S.J. 355. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 320. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 312. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 304. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3164 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2373.
SF2405 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.
SF2405 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.