IA SSB3164 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF2373
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2405

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2373.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act modifying provisions related to the distribution formula for general state financial aid to community colleges and including applicability provisions.(See SF 2373, SF 2405.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act modifying provisions related to the distribution formula for general state financial aid to community colleges and including applicability provisions.(See SF 2373, SF 2405.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-14SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2373.
2024-02-13SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2024-02-12SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2024 3:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2024-02-07SenateSubcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Giddens, and Rozenboom.
2024-02-07SenateIntroduced, referred to Education.
2024-02-07SenateBy COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

SF2373 (Replaced by) 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2405. S.J. 466.
SF2405 (Replaced by) 2024-05-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback