IA SF2369 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 570.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 570.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a person’s county of residence as the basis for determining financial responsibility for certain human services programs and treatment or support services. (Formerly SSB 3196.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to a person’s county of residence as the basis for determining financial responsibility for certain human services programs and treatment or support services. (Formerly SSB 3196.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 570. |
2018-03-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 568. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 631. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 630. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-5138 filed, adopted. S.J. 630. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 399. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 394. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3196 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2018 12:00PM RM 24
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2369 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20180312_SJNL.pdf |