IA SF2348 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 641.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 641.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to tampering with witnesses, jurors, or reporting parties, and providing penalties.(Formerly SSB 3014.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to tampering with witnesses, jurors, or reporting parties, and providing penalties.(Formerly SSB 3014.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 641. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | HF 2250 substituted. S.J. 640. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5100 filed, adopted. S.J. 640. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Attached to HF 2250. S.J. 404. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 293. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 287. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB506 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2250.
SSB3014 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2348.
HF2250 (Similar To) 2024-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.
SSB3014 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2348.
HF2250 (Similar To) 2024-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.