IA SF2341 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 714.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 714.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the rebate of sales tax imposed and collected at an automobile racetrack facility and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3162.) Effective 4-2-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the rebate of sales tax imposed and collected at an automobile racetrack facility and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3162.) Effective 4-2-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 714. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 653. |
2014-03-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 600. |
2014-04-01 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 639. |
2014-03-26 | House | Passed House, ayes 82, nays 14. H.J. 596. |
2014-03-26 | House | Substituted for HF 2451. H.J. 595. |
2014-03-25 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 569. |
2014-03-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 564. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 629. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 36, nays 9. S.J. 624. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 586. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 584. |