IA SF2323 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the initial care plan for minor and adult guardianships and the initial plan and inventory for adult conservatorships, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3131.) Effective date: 06/17/2020. Applicability date: 01/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the initial care plan for minor and adult guardianships and the initial plan and inventory for adult conservatorships, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3131.) Effective date: 06/17/2020. Applicability date: 01/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 864. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 676. |
2020-06-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 642. |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 1. H.J. 639. |
2020-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar H.J. 595. |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 595. |
2020-03-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2020 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-03-04 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Hagenow and Wolfe. H.J. 514. |
2020-03-03 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 421. |
2020-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 413. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 481. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 479. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 360. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 351. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3131 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2323.