IA SF2309 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to milk and associated products, by providing for certain items relating to milk to be transferred directly to individuals by milk producers owning or operating certain dairy farms, providing for the labeling of raw milk and associated products, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3126.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to milk and associated products, by providing for certain items relating to milk to be transferred directly to individuals by milk producers owning or operating certain dairy farms, providing for the labeling of raw milk and associated products, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3126.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5049 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5049 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 546. |
2022-03-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 513. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 480. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 15. S.J. 480. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5049 filed, lost. S.J. 479. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5045 adopted. S.J. 479. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5033 withdrawn. S.J. 479. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-5045 filed. S.J. 473. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5033 filed. S.J. 427. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 323. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 315. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3126 (Related) 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2309.