IA SF2306 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the notification by the ethics and campaign disclosure board of certain candidates that an amended disclosure report has been filed by another candidate. (Formerly SSB 3085.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning the notification by the ethics and campaign disclosure board of certain candidates that an amended disclosure report has been filed by another candidate. (Formerly SSB 3085.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671. |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee amendment H-8194 filed. H.J. 517. |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 516. |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee: Koester, Hein and Hunter. H.J. 395. |
2018-02-23 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 375. |
2018-02-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 355. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 420. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 420. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5037 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 419. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5031 filed, adopted. S.J. 419. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 337. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 330. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3085 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.