IA SF2293 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 605.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 605.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa drug policy coordinator and the Iowa drug policy advisory council.(Formerly SSB 3024.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa drug policy coordinator and the Iowa drug policy advisory council.(Formerly SSB 3024.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 605. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | HF 2367 substituted. S.J. 604. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2367. S.J. 389. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 307. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 302. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3024 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2293.
HSB563 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2367.
HF2367 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
HSB563 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2367.
HF2367 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.