IA SSB3024 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2367
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2293
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2293
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2293.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2293.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa drug policy coordinator and the Iowa drug policy advisory council.(See SF 2293.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa drug policy coordinator and the Iowa drug policy advisory council.(See SF 2293.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2293. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 9:30AM Room G17. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Bolkcom, and Taylor, J. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB563 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2367.
HF2367 (Replaced by) 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
SF2293 (Replaced by) 2022-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 605.
HF2367 (Replaced by) 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
SF2293 (Replaced by) 2022-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 605.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3024 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3024.html |