IA HF2367 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa drug policy coordinator and the Iowa drug policy advisory council. (Formerly HSB 563.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa drug policy coordinator and the Iowa drug policy advisory council. (Formerly HSB 563.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 852. |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 851. |
2022-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 630. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 605. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 604. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2293. S.J. 604. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 2293. S.J. 389. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 389. |
2022-02-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 395. |
2022-02-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 381. |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 238. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3024 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2293.
HSB563 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2367.
SF2293 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 605.
HSB563 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2367.
SF2293 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 605.