IA SF2277 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Amendment H-8132 filed. H.J. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Amendment H-8132 filed. H.J. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sources of goods or services under a franchise agreement. (Formerly SF 2084.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sources of goods or services under a franchise agreement. (Formerly SF 2084.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8132 filed. H.J. 524. |
2016-03-18 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 506. |
2016-03-11 | House | Committee amendment H-8104 filed. H.J. 459. |
2016-03-11 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 458. |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-03-02 | House | Subcommittee, Rogers, Bearinger, and Jorgensen. H.J. 401. |
2016-03-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Economic Growth. H.J. 378. |
2016-02-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 347. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 371. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 367. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 310. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 307. |