IA SF2271 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the duties and authority of the college student aid commission relating to the registration of certain postsecondary schools, to interstate reciprocity agreements, and to registration fees collected by the commission. (Formerly SF 2124.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the duties and authority of the college student aid commission relating to the registration of certain postsecondary schools, to interstate reciprocity agreements, and to registration fees collected by the commission. (Formerly SF 2124.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 719. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 623. |
2014-03-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 555. |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 552. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 496. |
2014-03-06 | House | Subcommittee, Stanerson, Byrnes, and Stutsman. H.J. 455. |
2014-02-28 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 373. |
2014-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 364. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 420. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 420. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 351. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 340. |