IA SF227 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 418. S.J. 408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 418. S.J. 408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for a monument to Martin Treptow on the capitol complex grounds.(See SF 418.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for a monument to Martin Treptow on the capitol complex grounds.(See SF 418.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 418. S.J. 408. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2021 10:00AM RM 111. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Giddens. S.J. 262. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 218. |
Same As/Similar To
HF511 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2021 8:30AM House Lounge (Cancelled).
SF418 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 726.
SF418 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 726.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF227 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF227.html |