IA HF511 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2021 8:30AM House Lounge (Cancelled).
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2021 8:30AM House Lounge (Cancelled).
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for a monument to Martin Treptow on the capitol complex grounds.
Title
A bill for an act providing for a monument to Martin Treptow on the capitol complex grounds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2021 8:30AM House Lounge (Cancelled). |
2021-02-23 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, Nordman and Donahue. H.J. 532. |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 389. |
Same As/Similar To
SF227 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 418. S.J. 408.
SF418 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 726.
SF418 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 726.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF511 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF511.html |