IA SF2269 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 564.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 564.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying supplementary weighting for shared operational functions of school districts and area education agencies and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3150.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying supplementary weighting for shared operational functions of school districts and area education agencies and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3150.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 564. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | House File 2271 substituted. S.J. 563. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5068 filed, adopted. S.J. 563. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 550. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 351. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 340. |