IA SF2259 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 761.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 761.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning treatment of a person with a serious mental impairment who fails to comply with an outpatient treatment order. (Formerly SSB 3151.) Effective 7-1-16.
Title
A bill for an act concerning treatment of a person with a serious mental impairment who fails to comply with an outpatient treatment order. (Formerly SSB 3151.) Effective 7-1-16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 761. |
2016-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 752. |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 752. |
2016-04-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 613. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 662. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 657. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5116. S.J. 657. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5116. S.J. 651. |
2016-04-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 603. |
2016-04-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 600. |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee amendment H-8099 adopted. H.J. 600. |
2016-03-18 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 506. |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee amendment H-8099 filed. H.J. 454. |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 452. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-03-03 | House | Subcommittee, Gustafson, Dawson, and T. Moore. H.J. 417. |
2016-03-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 380. |
2016-03-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 375. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 408. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 407. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 283. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 279. |