IA SF2254 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 355.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 355.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring certain group health insurance policies, contracts, or plans to provide coverage for autism spectrum disorders for certain persons, providing for a repeal, and including applicability and effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2072.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring certain group health insurance policies, contracts, or plans to provide coverage for autism spectrum disorders for certain persons, providing for a repeal, and including applicability and effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2072.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 355. |
2016-02-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 347. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 366. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 41, nays 7. S.J. 365. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 282. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 278. |