IA SF2237 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 720.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 720.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to financial reporting by insurance holding company systems.(Formerly SSB 3062.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to financial reporting by insurance holding company systems.(Formerly SSB 3062.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 720. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | HF 2217 substituted. S.J. 719. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2217. S.J. 374. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 255. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 246. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB547 (Related) 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2217.
SSB3062 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2237.
HF2217 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
SSB3062 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2237.
HF2217 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.