IA SSB3062 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2217
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2237
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2237
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to financial reporting by insurance holding company systems.(See SF 2237.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to financial reporting by insurance holding company systems.(See SF 2237.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2237. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 10:00AM Room G15. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Williams, Bisignano, and Goodwin. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB547 (Related) 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2217.
HF2217 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
SF2237 (Replaced by) 2022-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 720.
HF2217 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
SF2237 (Replaced by) 2022-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 720.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3062 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3062.html |