IA SF2227 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 551.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 551.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to exception to policy provisions for Medicaid home and community-based services waivers. (Formerly SF 2081.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to exception to policy provisions for Medicaid home and community-based services waivers. (Formerly SF 2081.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 551. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 287. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 284. |