IA SF2226 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to custody, physical care, and visitation provisions relating to a child of a parent who is serving active duty in the military service of the United States and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 2148.) Effective 4-27-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to custody, physical care, and visitation provisions relating to a child of a parent who is serving active duty in the military service of the United States and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 2148.) Effective 4-27-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1150. | |
2010-03-22 | Immediate message. S.J. 924. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 917. | |
2010-03-22 | Senate concurred with S-5290. S.J. 917. | |
2010-03-22 | Message from House, with amendment S-5290. S.J. 916. | |
2010-03-19 | Immediate message. H.J. 1115. | |
2010-03-19 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 1101. | |
2010-03-19 | Amendment H-8257 adopted. H.J. 1101. | |
2010-03-19 | Amendment H-8223 withdrawn. H.J. 1100. | |
2010-03-19 | Substituted for HF 2417. H.J. 1100. | |
2010-02-25 | Amendment H-8257 filed. H.J. 741. | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment H-8223 filed. H.J. 715. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed on file. H.J. 688. | |
2010-02-18 | Subcommittee, T. Olson, Schulte, and Willems. H.J. 620. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 590. | |
2010-02-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 563. | |
2010-02-16 | Immediate message. S.J. 430. | |
2010-02-16 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 428. | |
2010-02-08 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 304. | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 294. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0782B&ga=83 |