IA SF2223 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Returned to Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Returned to Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for tax credits and refunds relating to renewable fuels including their component biofuels and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2052; see SF 2309.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for tax credits and refunds relating to renewable fuels including their component biofuels and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2052; see SF 2309.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Returned to Committee. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Allen, and Breitbach. S.J. 344. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 276. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 259. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 254. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SF2223 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2223.html |