IA SF2215 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting cities and counties from imposing time-of-sale requirements on transactions involving real property. (Formerly SSB 3090.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting cities and counties from imposing time-of-sale requirements on transactions involving real property. (Formerly SSB 3090.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 525. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | HF 2286 substituted. S.J. 524. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2286. S.J. 407. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 282. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 272. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3090 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB596 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2286 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 595.
HSB596 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2286 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 595.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2215 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2215.html |