IA HSB596 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2286
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2215
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2215
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting cities and counties from imposing time-of-sale requirements on transactions involving real property.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting cities and counties from imposing time-of-sale requirements on transactions involving real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 9:00AM House Lounge |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Landon, Wills and McConkey. H.J. 172. |
2018-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HF2286 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 595.
SF2215 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.
SSB3090 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2215 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.
SSB3090 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB596 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB596.html |